ME LD1661 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Provisions of a Historic Preservation Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Clarify the Provisions of a Historic Preservation Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] |
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] | Rep. Russell Werts [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Enactment RC #678 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 678 (Yeas 141 - Nays 0 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-493). |
2014-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-493). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-493) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |