ME LD1660 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Authorizing the State Tax Assessor To Convey the Interest of the State in Certain Real Estate in the Unorganized Territory

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Authorizing the State Tax Assessor To Convey the Interest of the State in Certain Real Estate in the Unorganized Territory

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateFINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
2018-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2018-03-27SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-655), in concurrence.
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-655) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-27SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-03-27SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-655).
2018-03-22HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-22HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-11-29HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-11-29HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on November 27, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback