ME LD1659 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Maine's Marine Resources Laws Regarding Certain License Fees and Surcharges That Were Amended by Recently Enacted Legislation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Maine's Marine Resources Laws Regarding Certain License Fees and Surcharges That Were Amended by Recently Enacted Legislation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-02-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-01HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-01-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2018-01-30SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2018-01-30SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2018-01-25SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2018-01-25SenateREAD ONCE
2018-01-25SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2018-01-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2018-01-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-01-23HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-11-29HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-11-29HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on November 27, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback