ME LD1658 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Campaign Finance Transparency and Accountability in Municipal Elections
Title
An Act To Increase Campaign Finance Transparency and Accountability in Municipal Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Rep. Barbara Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #618 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #463 (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #463 (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-793) in concurrence |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-793) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 618 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-793). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-793) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 463 (Yeas 75 - Nays 55 - Absent 18 - Excused 07 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-09 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Reference to Committee. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-05-19 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Representative CAIAZZO from the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Reports a recommendation for a CHANGE OF COMMITEE. |
2021-05-19 | House | Report of the Chair-Pursuant to Joint Order S.P. 9 |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Reported Out: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Refer Approved by Chairs/Leads: REFER TO OTHER |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |