ME LD1655 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Consumer-owned Water Utilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Consumer-owned Water Utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-13HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-259).
2023-06-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-06-13HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-259) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-13HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-06-13HouseOn motion of Representative ZEIGLER of Montville, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-13HouseReports READ.
2023-06-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2023-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-259)
2023-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-259) READ and ADOPTED
2023-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2023-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-259) Report ACCEPTED
2023-06-12SenateReports READ
2023-06-12JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
2023-05-11JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-05-11JointWork Session Held
2023-04-13HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-13HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2023-04-13SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback