ME LD1654 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Stabilize State Funding for County Corrections
Title
An Act To Stabilize State Funding for County Corrections
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-994), in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-994) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-994). |
2022-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |