ME LD1654 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 689 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 689 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Economic Competitiveness in Maine by Extending the End Date for Pine Tree Development Zone Benefits and Making Other Changes to the Program
Title
An Act To Protect Economic Competitiveness in Maine by Extending the End Date for Pine Tree Development Zone Benefits and Making Other Changes to the Program
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] |
Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. John Picchiotti [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Enactment RC #689 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #632 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Table Until Later RC #617 (Y: 78 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #632 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Table Until Later RC #617 (Y: 78 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 689 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence Roll Call Ordered |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-472). |
2018-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-472) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 632 (Yeas 148 - Nays 0 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-18 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 617 (Yeas 78 - Nays 71 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2018-04-18 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative HERBIG of Belfast REMOVED. |
2018-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-472). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-472) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 27, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |