ME LD1652 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Build a Child Care System by Recruiting and Retaining Maine's Early Childhood Educators Workforce

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Build a Child Care System by Recruiting and Retaining Maine's Early Childhood Educators Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-09-29HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-07-19HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-02HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-30HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-17HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2021-06-10JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-06-10HouseReports READ.
2021-05-18JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-18JointWork Session Held
2021-05-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-05-03HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback