ME LD1646 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Vacate or Adjust Sentences and Expunge Arrests, Convictions and Adjudications for Cannabis-related Offenses
Title
An Act to Vacate or Adjust Sentences and Expunge Arrests, Convictions and Adjudications for Cannabis-related Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2023-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1646&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1056&item=1&snum=131 |