ME LD1641 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Further Study the Role of Water as a Resource
Title
Resolve, to Further Study the Role of Water as a Resource
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Sayre [D] | Rep. Arthur Bell [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Jauch [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2023-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2023-06-01 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-197), in concurrence. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-197) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-197). |
2023-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-04-13 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |