ME LD1640 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Campus Free Speech and Free Press Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Campus Free Speech and Free Press Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #218 (Y: 78 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #265 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #265 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 218 (Yeas 78 - Nays 53 - Absent 20 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 265 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |