ME LD164 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Funding of Lake Water Quality Restoration and Protection Projects
Title
An Act Regarding the Funding of Lake Water Quality Restoration and Protection Projects
Sponsors
Rep. William Bridgeo [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Tavis Hasenfus [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Raegan LaRochelle [D] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-07-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-07-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-442) thereto. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-442) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-442) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-442) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) was ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-41), in concurrence. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-41) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-41). |
2023-04-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |