ME LD164 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Property Taxes for Maine Residents
Title
An Act To Reduce Property Taxes for Maine Residents
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Rep. Donna Doore [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Report RC #220 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-231). |
2019-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-231) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 220 Yeas 30 - Nays 1 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |