ME LD164 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Tamper-evident Packaging for Recreational Marijuana Products
Title
An Act To Require Tamper-evident Packaging for Recreational Marijuana Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION in concurrence |
2017-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-26 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION. |
2017-01-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-01-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-01-19 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=164&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0122&item=1&snum=128 |