ME LD1639 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Health and Welfare of Maine Communities and Reduce Harmful Solid Waste
Title
An Act To Protect the Health and Welfare of Maine Communities and Reduce Harmful Solid Waste
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Enactment RC #549 (Y: 102 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #714 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #714 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 549 (Yeas 102 - Nays 25 - Absent 20 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) thereto. |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) was READ. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) thereto |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) thereto |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Senate Amendment "B" (S-525) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) READ |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 714 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-494) ACCEPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |