ME LD1638 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Help Seniors and Certain Persons with Disabilities Remain in Their Homes by Providing for the Deferral of Property Taxes
Title
An Act To Help Seniors and Certain Persons with Disabilities Remain in Their Homes by Providing for the Deferral of Property Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-335). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-335). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-335) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |