ME LD1635 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Minor Changes and Corrections to Statutes Administered by the Department of Environmental Protection
Title
An Act To Make Minor Changes and Corrections to Statutes Administered by the Department of Environmental Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |