ME LD1632 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Manufacturing Jobs Energy Program
Title
An Act To Establish the Manufacturing Jobs Energy Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1632&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0586&item=1&snum=128 |