ME LD1630 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Proportional Fines Commission
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Proportional Fines Commission
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] |
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #369 (Y: 80 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 369 (Yeas 80 - Nays 56 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2021-06-17 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-668) in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-668) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-668). |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-668) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |