ME LD1629 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Future Evaluations of the Pine Tree Development Zone Program
Title
An Act Regarding Future Evaluations of the Pine Tree Development Zone Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Herbig of Waldo REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2019-04-25 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | Representative MASTRACCIO for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 1001, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |