ME LD1620 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Exclude Collectively Bargained Salary and Job Promotion Increases from the Earnable Compensation Limitation for Retirement Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Exclude Collectively Bargained Salary and Job Promotion Increases from the Earnable Compensation Limitation for Retirement Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #189 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #197 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-18SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-06HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-199) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 189 (Yeas 86 - Nays 53 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative CARNEY of Cape Elizabeth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06HouseReports READ.
2019-06-05SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199)
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-199) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 197 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05SenateReports Read
2019-04-23HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-04-23SenateCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback