ME LD1619 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Establish a Moratorium on Offshore Wind Power Projects in Maine's Territorial Waters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Establish a Moratorium on Offshore Wind Power Projects in Maine's Territorial Waters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-30HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-18HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-18HousePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-351) thereto.
2021-06-18HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-18HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-351) thereto ADOPTED.
2021-06-18HouseSenate Amendment "A" (S-351) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-316) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-18HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-316) was READ.
2021-06-18HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-18HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2021-06-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-351) thereto
2021-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-316) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-351) thereto ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-351) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-316) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateTaken from the table by the President
2021-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-16SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Adoption of Committee Amendment "A" (S-316)
2021-06-16SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2021-06-15JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-06-04JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-06-04JointWork Session Held
2021-04-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-04-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback