ME LD1618 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance the Sustainability of the Corinna Water District
Title
An Act To Enhance the Sustainability of the Corinna Water District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - Enactment RC #591 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 591 (Yeas 135 - Nays 0 - Absent 16 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) |
2014-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |