ME LD1616 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure That Municipalities and Multimunicipal Regions of Every Size and Capacity Have Guidance on Climate Adaptation and Resilience Strategies for Policy, Implementation and Investment Decision Support
Title
An Act To Ensure That Municipalities and Multimunicipal Regions of Every Size and Capacity Have Guidance on Climate Adaptation and Resilience Strategies for Policy, Implementation and Investment Decision Support
Sponsors
Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] |
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Insist RC #750 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - Recede And Concur RC #561 (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #543 (Y: 68 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - Recede And Concur RC #561 (Y: 54 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #543 (Y: 68 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 750 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-917) |
2022-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 561 (Yeas 54 - Nays 72 - Absent 21 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-13 | House | Motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford to RECEDE and CONCUR to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED. |
2022-04-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-04-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her motion for a Roll Call. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford moved the Bill and accompanying papers be INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senator BRENNER of Cumberland moved The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-917). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-917) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 543 (Yeas 68 - Nays 49 - Absent 30 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-11 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-04-05 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2022-04-05 | House | Representative TUCKER of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |