ME LD1616 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Correct Errors and Inconsistencies in the Laws of Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Correct Errors and Inconsistencies in the Laws of Maine

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-03HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-03HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-07-03SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2017-07-01SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-07-01SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-556), in concurrence.
2017-07-01SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-556) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-01SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-07-01SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-556).
2017-06-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-18SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2017-05-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
2017-05-18HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-05-18HouseRepresentative MOONEN for the Revisor of Statutes pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 94, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback