ME LD1612 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Presumption of Abandonment of Gift Obligations
Title
An Act Regarding the Presumption of Abandonment of Gift Obligations
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] |
Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. James Handy [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-661) in concurrence |
2020-01-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-14 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-01-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-661). |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-661) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto. |
2020-01-14 | House | On motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1365) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-366) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-613), in concurrence. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-613) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-613). |
2019-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |