ME LD161 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ban the United Nations Agenda 21 in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ban the United Nations Agenda 21 in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #289 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #290 (Y: 75 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD).
2015-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2015-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-19HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2015-06-18SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-06-18SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-463) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2015-06-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-463) READ and ADOPTED
2015-06-18SenateREAD ONCE
2015-06-18SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call # 289 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
2015-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator BURNS of Washington the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2015-06-18SenateReports READ
2015-06-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 290 (Yeas 75 - Nays 65 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
2015-06-18HouseOn motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2015-06-18HouseReports READ.
2015-02-03SenateOn motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence.
2015-01-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-01-29HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2015-01-29HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback