ME LD1606 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Tenant Representation on Boards of Directors of Nonprofit Housing Corporations
Title
An Act To Expand Tenant Representation on Boards of Directors of Nonprofit Housing Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #361 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-567) in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-567) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 361 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-567). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-567) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |