ME LD1606 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Funding for Career and Technical Education Programs
Title
An Act To Increase Funding for Career and Technical Education Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-03-17 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2020-03-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-423) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-423) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-423) Report ACCEPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1606&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0512&item=1&snum=129 |