ME LD1604 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Replace a Statue in the National Statuary Hall Collection
Title
An Act To Replace a Statue in the National Statuary Hall Collection
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-03-31 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-413). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-29 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-413). |
2016-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-413) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2016-02-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2016-02-25 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock for the Joint Standing Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Resolve 2015, chapter 51, section 2. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1604&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0645&item=1&snum=127 |