ME LD1599 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Maine Pesticide Sales and Use Registry
Title
An Act To Establish A Maine Pesticide Sales and Use Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1599&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1188&item=1&snum=130 |