ME LD1592 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove Barriers to Professional Licensing for Veterans
Title
An Act To Remove Barriers to Professional Licensing for Veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Golden [D] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Enactment RC #255 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 255 (Yeas 145 - Nays 0 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-06 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2017-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-307), in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-307) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-307). |
2017-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |