ME LD1588 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Replace Certain Stigmatizing Language in the Maine Revised Statutes with Respectful Language
Title
Resolve, To Replace Certain Stigmatizing Language in the Maine Revised Statutes with Respectful Language
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] |
Rep. Rena Newell [N] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-555) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-555) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-555). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-555) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |