ME LD1587 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study the Feasibility of the Establishment of Paid Family Leave in the State
Title
Resolve, To Study the Feasibility of the Establishment of Paid Family Leave in the State
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #652 (Y: 80 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #619 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #551 (Y: 80 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #619 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #551 (Y: 80 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 652V 80 having voted in the affirmative and 68 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-699) in concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-699) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 619 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-699) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-699). |
2018-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-699) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 551 (Yeas 80 - Nays 66 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |