ME LD1585 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Privacy and Security by Regulating the Use of Facial Surveillance Systems by Departments, Public Employees and Public Officials
Title
An Act To Increase Privacy and Security by Regulating the Use of Facial Surveillance Systems by Departments, Public Employees and Public Officials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-620), in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |