ME LD1584 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Attract, Build and Retain an Early Childhood Education Workforce through Increased Training, Education and Career Pathways

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Attract, Build and Retain an Early Childhood Education Workforce through Increased Training, Education and Career Pathways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #224 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464) in concurrence
2019-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-464) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 224 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-07SenateReports Read
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-464).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-464) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06HouseReports READ.
2019-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator Herbig of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS
2019-04-16HouseCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback