ME LD1582 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Maine Psilocybin Services Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Maine Psilocybin Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #775 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-19 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Senate INSISTED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-567) thereto |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her motion to Recede and Concur. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved that The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR |
2022-04-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2022-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-567) thereto |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-567) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-567) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ |
2022-04-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 775 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-03-25 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |