ME LD1582 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Name the Naples Bay Bridge on U.S. Route 302 in the Town of Naples the Robert Neault Memorial Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Name the Naples Bay Bridge on U.S. Route 302 in the Town of Naples the Robert Neault Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read Once |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-03-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence. |
2016-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-04 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |