ME LD1577 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Convene a Working Group To Study Possible Solutions for Families Facing Emergency Child Custody Situations
Title
Resolve, To Convene a Working Group To Study Possible Solutions for Families Facing Emergency Child Custody Situations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-336). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-336) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-336) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-336) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |