ME LD1573 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Development in the Logging Industry by Requiring State and Local Government Agencies To Give Preference to Timber Harvested in the State
Title
An Act To Encourage Development in the Logging Industry by Requiring State and Local Government Agencies To Give Preference to Timber Harvested in the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #397 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Adopt Scs-315 To Cas-269 RC #394 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Adopt Sas-307 To Cas-269 RC #393 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #358 (Y: 86 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Adopt Scs-315 To Cas-269 RC #394 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Adopt Sas-307 To Cas-269 RC #393 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #358 (Y: 86 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | LD 1573 In Senate, July 20, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 14 IN FAVOR and 16 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-29 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-29 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-315) thereto. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-315) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-315) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 394 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Senate Amendment "C" (S-315) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 393 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-307) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) FAILED ADOPTION |
2017-06-29 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-307) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) was READ |
2017-06-29 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION OF Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2017-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-20 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto. |
2017-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, House Amendment "B" (H-520) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) was READ. |
2017-06-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 358 (Yeas 86 - Nays 57 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |