ME LD1572 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee To Improve the Efficiency and Effectiveness of Legislative Reviews of Tax Expenditures
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee To Improve the Efficiency and Effectiveness of Legislative Reviews of Tax Expenditures
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #385 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #400 (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #400 (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | Senate | LD 1572 In Senate, June 27, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 400V 131 having voted in the affirmative and 13 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-27 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Katz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2017-05-04 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-04 | House | Representative MASTRACCIO for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 1001, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |