ME LD1572 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Nondiscrimination against Gun Owners in Certain Federally Subsidized Housing
Title
An Act To Ensure Nondiscrimination against Gun Owners in Certain Federally Subsidized Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #538 (Y: 54 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - House - Reference To Judiciary RC #475 (Y: 69 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - House - Reference To Judiciary RC #475 (Y: 69 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405). |
2016-03-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-30 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 538 (Yeas 54 - Nays 92 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-30 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2016-03-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-03-28 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-28 | House | Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2016-02-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-11 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2016-02-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 475 (Yeas 69 - Nays 74 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-11 | House | Subsequently, the motion to REFER the Bill to the Committee on JUDICIARY FAILED. |
2016-02-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-02-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-02 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2016-02-02 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2016-02-02 | House | Speaker EVES of North Berwick moved that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-01-26 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2016-01-21 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY |