ME LD157 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Car Seats
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Car Seats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=157&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0044&item=1&snum=129 |