ME LD1560 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Utility Reorganizations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Utility Reorganizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #195 (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
2019-06-11SenateMotion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2019-06-11SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-06-10HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HouseThe House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-07SenateFAILED ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 195 (Yeas 136 - Nays 4 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-06HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-06HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-192).
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-05HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-04SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-192).
2019-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-192) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-04SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-04-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-04-16SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback