ME LD1560 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Allow Further Review of the Report Defining Cost Responsibility for Deaf and Hard-of-hearing Students Receiving Services from the Maine Educational Center for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing and the Governor Baxter School for the Deaf

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Allow Further Review of the Report Defining Cost Responsibility for Deaf and Hard-of-hearing Students Receiving Services from the Maine Educational Center for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing and the Governor Baxter School for the Deaf

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2013-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-06-10HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2013-06-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2013-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2013-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2013-06-07HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2013-06-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2013-06-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ TWICE and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2013-06-06SenateREAD ONCE.
2013-06-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2013-06-06SenateReported by Senator MILLETT for the Joint Standing Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Public Law 2011, chapter 683, section 11.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback