ME LD1556 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create the Commission To Study and Recommend a Financing Model To Increase Capital Investment in Renewable Energy, Clean Energy Technology, Energy Efficiency Projects and Jobs in Maine
Title
Resolve, To Create the Commission To Study and Recommend a Financing Model To Increase Capital Investment in Renewable Energy, Clean Energy Technology, Energy Efficiency Projects and Jobs in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 20, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1556&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0498&item=1&snum=130 |