ME LD1555 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund Broadband Internet Infrastructure for Marginalized Groups in the State
Title
An Act To Fund Broadband Internet Infrastructure for Marginalized Groups in the State
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Richard Evans [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] |
Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #152 (Y: 84 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-377) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-377) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-377). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-377) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 152 (Yeas 84 - Nays 61 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |