ME LD1550 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To End the Sale of Flavored Tobacco Products
Title
An Act To End the Sale of Flavored Tobacco Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-01-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-01-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-09-29 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-09-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-07-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-07-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative, TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended . |
2021-06-14 | House | Representative MEYER of Eliot moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended . |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021. |