ME LD1543 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #266 (Y: 91 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #226 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-235).
2019-06-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-235) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 266 (Yeas 91 - Nays 54 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2019-06-14HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-14HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-13HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-12HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-10HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2019-06-10HouseReports READ.
2019-06-07SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-235)
2019-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-235) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 226 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-07SenateReports Read
2019-04-18HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-04-16SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-04-16SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
2019-04-16SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-04-11SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-11SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2019-04-11SenateCommittee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback