ME LD1541 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Support and Improve Municipal Recycling Programs and Save Taxpayer Money

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Support and Improve Municipal Recycling Programs and Save Taxpayer Money

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Recede And Concur RC #421 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #442 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Hah To Ca RC #441 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone Sas-330 RC #440 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Reconsider RC #439 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Sas-330 To Cah-605 RC #433 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #432 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Adopt Hah-714 To Cah-605 RC #335 (Y: 86 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #334 (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-07-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-07-02HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 421 (Yeas 75 - Nays 47 - Absent 29 - Excused 0)
2021-07-02HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-382) thereto.
2021-07-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-07-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-714) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-382) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-07-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-382) thereto ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-382) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) READ and ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) thereto was ADOPTED
2021-07-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) in concurrence
2021-07-02SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2021-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 442 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) thereto in concurrence
2021-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) thereto ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 441 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-714) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 440 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateSame Senator moved to to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605)
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 433 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) was ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateTaken from the table by the President
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-605) READ
2021-06-17SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 432 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
2021-06-17SenateReports READ
2021-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) thereto.
2021-06-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-605) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-714) thereto was ADOPTED.
2021-06-16HouseROLL CALL NO. 335 (Yeas 86 - Nays 57 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
2021-06-16HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, House Amendment "A" (H-714) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-605) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-605) was READ.
2021-06-16HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-16HouseROLL CALL NO. 334 (Yeas 84 - Nays 59 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
2021-06-16HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-16HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-14HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report.
2021-06-14JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM
2021-06-14HouseReports READ.
2021-05-24JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-24JointWork Session Held
2021-04-20HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-04-20HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on April 20, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1541&snum=130
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1146&item=1&snum=130
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1146&item=11&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1146&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1146&item=5&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1146&item=9&snum=130
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN154102.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN154105.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN154109.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN154111.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=House&serialnumber=334
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=House&serialnumber=335
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=432
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=433
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=439
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=440
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=441
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=442
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280080518&chamber=House&serialnumber=421

Bill Comments

feedback